AZ HM2002 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Burn pits; health risks; veterans
Title
Burn pits; health risks; veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2014-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-2-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |