AZ HCR2029 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Senate NRRA Committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Senate NRRA Committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Wupatki; wilderness area; opposition
Title
Wupatki; wilderness area; opposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-16-7-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |