AZ HCR2027 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to Senate GE Committee
Pending: Senate Government and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Referred to Senate GE Committee
Pending: Senate Government and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Application; Article V convention
Title
Application; Article V convention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (26-32-2-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House FFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |