AZ HCR2022 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; exemption
Title
Personal property tax; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |