AZ HCR2005 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-16 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Investigational drugs; biological products; devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigational drugs; biological products; devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-16 Transmitted to Secretary Of State
2014-04-15SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0)
2014-04-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-04-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-12SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2014-03-11SenateReferred to Senate HHS Committee
2014-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-03-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-23-6-0)
2014-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-1-1-3-0)
2014-01-28HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-13HouseHouse RHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2014-01-29HouseReferred to House RHS Committee
2014-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-28HouseAssigned to House RHS Committee
2014-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=HCR2005
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/laws/hcr2005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.hcr2005-p1-montenegro.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.hcr2005-rhs.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.hcr2005pl.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005.hrhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005.shhs.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hcr2005.sthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback