AZ HB2639 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Identity theft; violation; penalties
Title
Identity theft; violation; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 159 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-3-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |