AZ HB2625 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Penalty assessment; victims' rights enforcement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalty assessment; victims' rights enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22 Chapter 158
2014-04-22 Governor Signed
2014-04-17 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-17SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-17SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0)
2014-04-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-04-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-25SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Senate APPROP Committee
2014-03-17SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-3-0)
2014-03-11SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2014-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2014-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-03-07HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-03-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2014-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2014-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2014-02-17HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2014-02-18HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-02-18HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-02-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=HB2625
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/laws/0158.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.2625-p1-farnsworth.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2625-jud.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2625ef.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sapprop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback