AZ HB2625 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Domestic relations; disposition of property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic relations; disposition of property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-12 - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 17 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-11 Governor Signed
2012-04-30 Transmitted to Governor
2012-04-19 House final reading , voting: (36-21-2-0)
2012-04-12 House minority caucus: Do pass
2012-04-12 House majority caucus: Do pass
2012-04-12 Transmit to House
2012-03-28 Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0)
2012-03-28 Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2012-03-26 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-26 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-26 Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2012-03-05 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-03-12 Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2012-03-07 Referred to Senate JUD Committee
2012-03-07 Senate BI Committee action: Withdrawn
2012-03-06 Referred to Senate BI Committee
2012-03-06 Senate read second time
2012-03-05 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-03-07 Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
2012-03-05 Assigned to Senate BI Committee
2012-03-05 Introduced in Senate and read first time
2012-03-02 Transmit to Senate
2012-03-01 House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-2-0)
2012-03-01 House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2012-02-28 House majority caucus: Do pass
2012-02-28 House minority caucus: Do pass
2012-02-27 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0)
2012-01-18 Referred to House RULES Committee
2012-02-16 House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0)
2012-01-19 Referred to House JUD Committee
2012-01-19 House read second time
2012-01-18 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-01-18 Assigned to House JUD Committee
2012-01-18 Introduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=107&Bill_Number=HB2625
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/laws/0337.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hmotion.11.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sthird.2.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.hfinal.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/50leg/2r/bills/hb2625.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback