AZ HB2618 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Police training; potentially violent persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police training; potentially violent persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-13 - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2013-03-05SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-13SenateSenate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2013-03-06SenateReferred to Senate PS Committee
2013-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate PS Committee
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2013-03-01HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0)
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2013-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2013-02-12HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-02-20HouseHouse PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2013-02-13HouseReferred to House PSMRA Committee
2013-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2013-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-02-12HouseAssigned to House PSMRA Committee
2013-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=110&Bill_Number=HB2618
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/h.2618-p1-pierce.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/h.2618-psmra.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/adopted/h.2618-f2-kavanagh.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/proposed/s.26181029.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618.hpsmra.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/1r/bills/hb2618.sps.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback