AZ HB2614 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State budget; estimates; public notice
Title
State budget; estimates; public notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House FFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |