AZ HB2593 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Death; postconviction; appellate proceedings; dismissal
Title
Death; postconviction; appellate proceedings; dismissal
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 156 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | House | House final reading , voting: (53-4-3-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |