AZ HB2555 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Potentially violent persons; reporting requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Potentially violent persons; reporting requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2013-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2013-02-07HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-02-20HouseHouse PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-1-0)
2013-02-11HouseReferred to House PSMRA Committee
2013-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2013-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-02-07HouseAssigned to House PSMRA Committee
2013-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback