AZ HB2490 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; mental health first aid
Title
Appropriation; mental health first aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-16-3-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |