AZ HB2462 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bail bond agents; lists; loitering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail bond agents; lists; loitering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-28 Governor Signed
2013-03-26 Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-25SenateTransmit to House
2013-03-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0)
2013-03-18SenateSenate Consent Calendar March 18, 2013 @ 1:25 PM
2013-03-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2013-03-05SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-11SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0)
2013-03-06SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2013-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2013-03-01HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-02-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-6-0)
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2013-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2013-01-23HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-02-21HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2013-01-24HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2013-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2013-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-01-23HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2013-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback