AZ HB2429 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Towed vehicles; impounded notification
Title
Towed vehicles; impounded notification
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 266 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-24 | House | House final reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2014-04-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |