AZ HB2385 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cost accounting; study committee
Title
Cost accounting; study committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-3-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-22-5-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House FFR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |