AZ HB2318 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Domestic violence; arrest; predominant aggressor
Title
Domestic violence; arrest; predominant aggressor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |