AZ HB2313 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Capital sentencing; aggravators; serious offenses
Title
Capital sentencing; aggravators; serious offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | House | House final reading , voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2014-04-22 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-2-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |