AZ HB2307 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred prosecution fund
Title
Deferred prosecution fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 206 | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-21 | House | House final reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |