AZ HB2196 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1270

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-02-27 - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Election law amendments; repeal...

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election law amendments; repeal...

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27 Chapter 5
2014-02-27 Governor Signed
2014-02-24 Transmitted to Governor
2014-02-21SenateTransmit to House
2014-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2014-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-13HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0)
2014-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2014-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0)
2014-01-22HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-01-30HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-2-0)
2014-01-23HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1270 (Replaces) 2014-02-20 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback