AZ HB2144 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School pupils; academic intervention
Title
School pupils; academic intervention
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Rosanna Gabaldon [D] | Rep. Jonathan Larkin [D] |
Rep. Richard Miranda [D] | Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-22-4-0) |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |