AZ HB2098 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Loan originators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan originators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23 Chapter 196
2014-04-23 Governor Signed
2014-04-22 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-21HouseHouse final reading , voting: (49-6-5-0)
2014-04-21HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2014-04-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-17SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-17SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0)
2014-04-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-04-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-19SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-05SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-3-0)
2014-02-20SenateReferred to Senate FIN Committee
2014-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-18HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0)
2014-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2014-01-22HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-03HouseHouse FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0)
2014-01-23HouseReferred to House FI Committee
2014-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House FI Committee
2014-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=HB2098
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.2098217.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.2098fin.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/2098worsley312.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.hfi.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.sfin.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2098.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback