AZ HB2092 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of environmental quality; continuation
Title
Department of environmental quality; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |