AR SB377 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that SB377 is now Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Revise Notification And Storage Policies And Procedures For Self-storage Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Revise Notification And Storage Policies And Procedures For Self-storage Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-12 - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14SenateNotification that SB377 is now Act 364
2013-03-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-03-13SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-03-12SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-03-12SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-03-12HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-03-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-02-20SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2013-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2013-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback