AR SB185 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 15 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Natural Resources And Economic Development.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 15 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Natural Resources And Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |