AR SB1138 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1138 is now Act 1194
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate Pharmacy Benefits Managers' Maintenance And Use Of Maximum Allowable Cost Lists For Prescription Drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate Pharmacy Benefits Managers' Maintenance And Use Of Maximum Allowable Cost Lists For Prescription Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-09 - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-12SenateNotification that SB1138 is now Act 1194
2013-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-09SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-09HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback