AR HB2160 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Sterilization Of Certain Dogs Or Cats Over Six (6) Months Of Age.
Title
To Require Sterilization Of Certain Dogs Or Cats Over Six (6) Months Of Age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2160 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB2160.pdf |