AL SB93 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Industries Dept, public warehouses, permits, bonds filed with Commissioner of Agriculture and Industries, recording in office of judge of probate repealed, Sec. 8-15-8 repealed
Title
Agriculture and Industries Dept, public warehouses, permits, bonds filed with Commissioner of Agriculture and Industries, recording in office of judge of probate repealed, Sec. 8-15-8 repealed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |