AL SB87 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telephone service, basic, obligation of carrier of last resort, exceptions based on arrangements with alternative carriers by property owner or developer, Sec. 37-2A-8 am'd.
Title
Telephone service, basic, obligation of carrier of last resort, exceptions based on arrangements with alternative carriers by property owner or developer, Sec. 37-2A-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-622. | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 998 | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2011-04-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 184 | |
2011-04-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 183 | |
2011-04-05 | Marsh Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |