AL SB388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement, Teachers (TRS) and State Employees (ERS), new defined benefit plan for persons entering TRS and ERS on or after January 1, 2013; contributions, minimum retirement ages, and benefits provided, Secs. 16-25-1, 16-25-3, 16-25-11.1, 16-25-14, 16-25-21, 36-26-36.1, 36-27-1, 36-27-4, 36-27-16, 36-27-24, 36-27-59 am'd
Title
Retirement, Teachers (TRS) and State Employees (ERS), new defined benefit plan for persons entering TRS and ERS on or after January 1, 2013; contributions, minimum retirement ages, and benefits provided, Secs. 16-25-1, 16-25-3, 16-25-11.1, 16-25-14, 16-25-21, 36-26-36.1, 36-27-1, 36-27-4, 36-27-16, 36-27-24, 36-27-59 am'd
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Slade Blackwell [R] | Sen. Dick Brewbaker [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. Trip Pittman [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-377. | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1323 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 548 | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 547 | |
2012-04-10 | Bedford 3rd Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 546. | |
2012-04-10 | Bedford 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 545.. | |
2012-04-10 | Bedford 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 544 | |
2012-04-10 | Orr Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 543 | |
2012-04-10 | Finance and Taxation General Fund 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-10 | Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-10 | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |