AL SB354 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disorderly conduct, definition revised, carrying a pistol in a vehicle without a pistol permit, authorized, discretion of sheriff in concealed pistol licensing eliminated under certain conditions, certain provisions of concealed pistol licensing revised, Secs. 13A-11-7, 13A-11-73, 13A-11-74, 13A-11-75 am'd.
Title
Disorderly conduct, definition revised, carrying a pistol in a vehicle without a pistol permit, authorized, discretion of sheriff in concealed pistol licensing eliminated under certain conditions, certain provisions of concealed pistol licensing revised, Secs. 13A-11-7, 13A-11-73, 13A-11-74, 13A-11-75 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Beason motion to Adopt Beason substitute (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Beason motion to Table (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Beason motion to Adopt Beason substitute (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Beason motion to Table (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Beason motion to reconsider and table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 940 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Beason motion to Adopt Beason substitute adopted Roll Call 939 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 938 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Beason motion to Table Smitherman Amendment No. 2 adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate lost Roll Call 785 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment No. 2 Offered. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 784 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Beason first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 783 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |