AL SB326 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings, green building standards, wood products, use of certain forest certification standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings, green building standards, wood products, use of certain forest certification standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HousePending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
2013-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2013-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 398
2013-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-03-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback