AL SB286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle, disability, disabled parking, placards to contain full name of person with disability, Sec. 32-6-231 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicle, disability, disabled parking, placards to contain full name of person with disability, Sec. 32-6-231 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 299 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 298 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |