AL SB256 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-20 - Assigned Act No. 2014-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cotton producers, assessments to promote cotton, referendum without refund provisions authorized, Sec. 2-8-193 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cotton producers, assessments to promote cotton, referendum without refund provisions authorized, Sec. 2-8-193 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-278.
2014-03-20HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled
2014-03-20SenatePassed Second House
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 929
2014-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-19HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2014-01-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 176
2014-01-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback