AL SB25 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Pending: House Boards, Agencies and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterinarians, employed by 501(c)(3) entity exempt from certain employment and ownership restrictions, Secs. 34-29-61, 34-29-87, 34-29-88 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinarians, employed by 501(c)(3) entity exempt from certain employment and ownership restrictions, Secs. 34-29-61, 34-29-87, 34-29-88 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2013-04-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588
2013-04-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-02-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback