AL SB202 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Jurors, persons 70 years of age or older authorized to request exemption from jury service, removal from master list of potential jurors, reinstatement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jurors, persons 70 years of age or older authorized to request exemption from jury service, removal from master list of potential jurors, reinstatement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-27 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Dunn motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-18HousePending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
2014-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-02-27SenateEngrossed
2014-02-26SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554
2014-02-26SenateDunn motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 553
2014-02-26SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2014-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback