AL SB129 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Forwarded to Governor on May 25, 2011 at 3:50 p.m. on May 25, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Forwarded to Governor on May 25, 2011 at 3:50 p.m. on May 25, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters Annuity and Benefit Fund, voluntary contribution by state income tax check-off provided for, Act 2010-726, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 36-21-186 am'd.
Title
Firefighters Annuity and Benefit Fund, voluntary contribution by state income tax check-off provided for, Act 2010-726, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 36-21-186 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Forwarded to Governor on May 25, 2011 at 3:50 p.m. on May 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-25 | Assigned Act No. 2011-312. | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 865 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund | |
2011-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55 | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |