AL SB12 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wind Energy Conversion Systems, regulation provided for, Public Service Commission required to issue permit, certification by licensed engineer required, regulation of location, design, and installation of systems, Alabama Wind Energy Conversion Act
Title
Wind Energy Conversion Systems, regulation provided for, Public Service Commission required to issue permit, certification by licensed engineer required, regulation of location, design, and installation of systems, Alabama Wind Energy Conversion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - Beckman motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Poole motion to Carry Over (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - Nordgren motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Poole motion to Carry Over (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - Nordgren motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Further Consideration |
2014-04-01 | House | Baughn intended vote "Yea" |
2014-04-01 | House | Beckman motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Roll Call 996 |
2014-04-01 | House | Hall motion to Carry Over to Day Certain lost Voice Vote |
2014-04-01 | House | Williams (J) motion to Carry Over lost Roll Call 995 |
2014-04-01 | House | Nordgren first Substitute Offered |
2014-04-01 | House | Nordgren motion to Table adopted Roll Call 992 |
2014-04-01 | House | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 590 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 589 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 588 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Williams motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 441 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Williams first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Williams motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Energy and Natural Resources first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources |