AL HJR327 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 3:40 p.m. on April 21, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 3:40 p.m. on April 21, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Peeler, Milton Booth, death mourned
Title
Peeler, Milton Booth, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Delivered to Governor at 3:40 p.m. on April 21, 2011. | |
2011-04-21 | Assigned Act No. 2011-185. | |
2011-04-21 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-04-21 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-21 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-21 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-21 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-14 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-04-14 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-14 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-04-12 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |