AL HB9 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 11:00 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Beer, cider, and wine, homebrewing in limited amounts by person 21 years of age or older for personal use, penalties, convicted felon prohibited from homebrewing, Sec. 28-3-1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer, cider, and wine, homebrewing in limited amounts by person 21 years of age or older for personal use, penalties, convicted felon prohibited from homebrewing, Sec. 28-3-1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-08 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Rogers motion to Previous Question (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 40 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - McCutcheon motion to Table (Y: 42 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 58 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-09HouseForwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 11:00 a.m.
2013-05-09HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-204.
2013-05-09HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-09HouseEnrolled
2013-05-09SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-09HousePassed Second House
2013-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904
2013-05-07SenatePending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Job Creation and Economic Development.
2013-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-04SenateMarsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 303
2013-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development
2013-04-02HouseEngrossed
2013-04-02HouseGrimsley intended to vote "Nay"
2013-04-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 239
2013-04-02HouseRogers motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 238
2013-04-02HouseHubbard (J) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote
2013-04-02HouseMcCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 237
2013-04-02HouseFarley Amendment Offered
2013-04-02HouseMcCutcheon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 236
2013-04-02HouseJones Amendment Offered
2013-04-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 235
2013-04-02HouseEconomic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered
2013-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-02-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-02-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=79344&LABEL=HB9
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB9-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB9-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB9-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462138&VOTE=235&BODY=1755&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462157&VOTE=236&BODY=1755&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462162&VOTE=237&BODY=1755&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462182&VOTE=238&BODY=1755&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462183&VOTE=239&BODY=1755&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462859&VOTE=303&BODY=1753&INST=HB9&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=473977&VOTE=904&BODY=1753&INST=HB9&SESS=1061

Bill Comments

feedback