AL HB642 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation Department, highway projects, construction contract plan changes, approval by the Director of Transportation up to certain amounts without approval of Governor, Sec. 23-1-60 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Department, highway projects, construction contract plan changes, approval by the Director of Transportation up to certain amounts without approval of Governor, Sec. 23-1-60 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-10 Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
2012-05-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2012-05-01 Engrossed
2012-05-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1100
2012-05-01 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1099
2012-05-01 Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered
2012-05-01 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-19 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-04-05 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback