AL HB600 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Franklin Co., Water Coordinating and Fire Prevention Authority, services expanded to include sewage and broadband services, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franklin Co., Water Coordinating and Fire Prevention Authority, services expanded to include sewage and broadband services, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateDelivered to Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-285.
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1230
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903
2014-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-19HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback