AL HB600 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Etowah Co., school resource officers, retired law enforcement officers allowed to serve on part-time basis, certification as peace officer required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Etowah Co., school resource officers, retired law enforcement officers allowed to serve on part-time basis, certification as peace officer required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-425 on 05/22/2013.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1183
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-09SenateDial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 946
2013-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2013-04-16HouseEngrossed
2013-04-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 498
2013-04-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 497
2013-04-16HouseLocal Legislation first Substitute Offered
2013-04-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-04-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=81268&LABEL=HB600
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB600-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB600-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB600-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=465476&VOTE=497&BODY=1755&INST=HB600&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=465477&VOTE=498&BODY=1755&INST=HB600&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=474794&VOTE=946&BODY=1753&INST=HB600&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=476776&VOTE=1183&BODY=1753&INST=HB600&SESS=1061

Bill Comments

feedback