AL HB59 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, secretary of state to provide free computerized statewide voter registration list to other state chief election officials upon request Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.
Title
Elections, secretary of state to provide free computerized statewide voter registration list to other state chief election officials upon request Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193 |
2014-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |