AL HB573 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., (26th Judicial Circuit), pretrial diversion program, district attorney authorized to establish
Title
Russell Co., (26th Judicial Circuit), pretrial diversion program, district attorney authorized to establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-364. | |
2012-05-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1108 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 626 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |