AL HB57 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, physician involvement and admitting privileges at local hospital required, certain standard in treatment and care required, reporting of name of minor child to Human Resources Department and law enforcement under certain conditions, criminal penalties, Women's Health and Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, physician involvement and admitting privileges at local hospital required, certain standard in treatment and care required, reporting of name of minor child to Human Resources Department and law enforcement under certain conditions, criminal penalties, Women's Health and Safety Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - McClurkin motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Beason motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Beason motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Beason motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Smith motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Beason motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - McClurkin motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 40 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-04 Forwarded to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 4, 2013.
2013-04-04 Assigned Act No. 2913-79.
2013-04-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-04-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-04-04SenateSignature Requested
2013-04-04HouseEnrolled
2013-04-02HouseMcClurkin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 253
2013-04-02HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-04-02SenateBeason motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 278
2013-04-02SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 277
2013-04-02SenateBeason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 276
2013-04-02SenateSmith Amendment Offered
2013-04-02SenateBeason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 275
2013-04-02SenateSmith Amendment Offered
2013-04-02SenateSmith motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 274
2013-04-02SenateSmith Amendment Offered
2013-04-02SenateBeason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 273
2013-04-02SenateColeman Amendment Offered
2013-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-03-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2013-02-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44
2013-02-19HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 43
2013-02-19HouseRogers Amendment Offered
2013-02-19HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 42
2013-02-19HouseHubbard (J) Amendment Offered
2013-02-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-02-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=79494&LABEL=HB57
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB57-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB57-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=456731&VOTE=42&BODY=1755&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=456788&VOTE=43&BODY=1755&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=456790&VOTE=44&BODY=1755&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462348&VOTE=252&BODY=1755&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462210&VOTE=273&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462229&VOTE=274&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462213&VOTE=275&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462215&VOTE=276&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462218&VOTE=277&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462219&VOTE=278&BODY=1753&INST=HB57&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=462348&VOTE=253&BODY=1755&INST=HB57&SESS=1061

Bill Comments

feedback