AL HB494 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, minors, definition of alt., written parental consent required, procedure by physicians required, Secs. 26-21-1 to 26-21-4, inclusive, 26-21-7 am'd., Secs. 26-21-6.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, minors, definition of alt., written parental consent required, procedure by physicians required, Secs. 26-21-1 to 26-21-4, inclusive, 26-21-7 am'd., Secs. 26-21-6.1 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Cosponsors Added (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-445.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-04-03HouseJones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1104
2014-04-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1166
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1165
2014-04-03SenateWard first Substitute Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2014-03-04HouseEngrossed
2014-03-04HouseCosponsors Added
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 516
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 515
2014-03-04HouseHealth first Substitute Offered
2014-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=84209&LABEL=HB494
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB494-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB494-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB494-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490791&VOTE=515&BODY=1755&INST=HB494&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490792&VOTE=516&BODY=1755&INST=HB494&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490793&VOTE=517&BODY=1755&INST=HB494&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=500258&VOTE=1165&BODY=1753&INST=HB494&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=500259&VOTE=1166&BODY=1753&INST=HB494&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=500507&VOTE=1104&BODY=1755&INST=HB494&SESS=1062

Bill Comments

feedback