AL HB493 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortions, pregnant woman may not receive an abortion based on lethal fetal anomaly, unless made aware of perinatal hospice services, penalties, civil sanctions, Perinatal Hospice Information Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortions, pregnant woman may not receive an abortion based on lethal fetal anomaly, unless made aware of perinatal hospice services, penalties, civil sanctions, Perinatal Hospice Information Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn (Y: 39 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Wallace motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Wallace motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Wallace motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01SenatePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Health
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2014-03-04HouseEngrossed
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
2014-03-04HouseHurst intended to vote "Nay"
2014-03-04HouseWallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 512
2014-03-04HouseMelton 2nd Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseWallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 511
2014-03-04HouseBracy Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseHurst intended to vote "Yea"
2014-03-04HouseWallace motion to Table adopted Roll Call 510
2014-03-04HouseMelton 1st Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseHolmes (A) motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 509
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508
2014-03-04HouseWallace Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=84208&LABEL=HB493
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB493-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB493-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490731&VOTE=508&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490774&VOTE=510&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490776&VOTE=511&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490779&VOTE=512&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490780&VOTE=513&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490772&VOTE=509&BODY=1755&INST=HB493&SESS=1062

Bill Comments

feedback