AL HB490 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Fetal Heartbeat Act, prohibits physician from performing abortion without first determining fetal heartbeat, physician who does not make determination or who performs abortion when heartbeat detected is guilty of Class C felony

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fetal Heartbeat Act, prohibits physician from performing abortion without first determining fetal heartbeat, physician who does not make determination or who performs abortion when heartbeat detected is guilty of Class C felony

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - McClurkin motion to Table (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - McClurkin motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01SenatePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Health
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2014-03-04HouseEngrossed
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505
2014-03-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 504
2014-03-04HouseMcClurkin motion to Table adopted Roll Call 503
2014-03-04HouseMelton Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 502
2014-03-04HouseMcClurkin Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseMcClurkin motion to Table adopted Roll Call 501
2014-03-04HouseHealth Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=84196&LABEL=HB490
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB490-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB490-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490590&VOTE=501&BODY=1755&INST=HB490&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490760&VOTE=505&BODY=1755&INST=HB490&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490592&VOTE=502&BODY=1755&INST=HB490&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490650&VOTE=503&BODY=1755&INST=HB490&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490666&VOTE=504&BODY=1755&INST=HB490&SESS=1062

Bill Comments

feedback