AL HB489 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:05 a.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortions, information required to be provided to a woman prior to abortion, time period increased from 24 hours to 48 hours, Sec. 26-23A-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortions, information required to be provided to a woman prior to abortion, time period increased from 24 hours to 48 hours, Sec. 26-23A-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Motion to Adopt Figures Amendment (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Henry motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Henry motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:05 a.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-441.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-02HouseEnrolled
2014-04-02HousePassed Second House
2014-04-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1148
2014-04-02SenateMotion to Adopt Figures Amendment lost Roll Call 1147
2014-04-02SenateRules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1146
2014-04-02SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2014-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2014-03-04HouseHubbard (J) intended to vote "Yea"
2014-03-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 499
2014-03-04HouseHenry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 498
2014-03-04HouseBracy Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseHenry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 497
2014-03-04HouseTodd Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseTodd motion to withdraw her amendment adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-04HouseTodd Amendment Offered
2014-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=84195&LABEL=HB489
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB489-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2014RS/Printfiles/HB489-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490515&VOTE=497&BODY=1755&INST=HB489&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490544&VOTE=498&BODY=1755&INST=HB489&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=490550&VOTE=499&BODY=1755&INST=HB489&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=499711&VOTE=1146&BODY=1753&INST=HB489&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=499715&VOTE=1147&BODY=1753&INST=HB489&SESS=1062
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=499716&VOTE=1148&BODY=1753&INST=HB489&SESS=1062

Bill Comments

feedback